FL S0550 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a youth from being placed in disciplinary confinement; authorizing a youth to be placed in emergency confinement if certain conditions are met; requiring specific treatment for a youth who is in emergency confinement; requiring the Department of Corrections to review its policies and procedures relating to youth in confinement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth in Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Health Policy
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2021-01-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
H377 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback