FL S0548 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring the duties of the Department of Management Services concerning private correctional facilities to the Department of Corrections, etc.
Title
Correctional Privatization
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/548 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/548/BillText/Filed/HTML |