FL S0548 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to the definitions of "local hearing officer" and "traffic infraction detector," respectively and relating to the installation and use of traffic infraction detectors to enforce specified provisions when a driver fails to stop at a traffic signal, provisions that authorize the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, a county, or a municipality to use such detectors and that cap fines and provide for the deposit and use of fines, and the distribution of specified penalties, respectively, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Infraction Detectors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6001 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S176 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2837Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31600831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31607456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160776Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
318121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback