FL S0544 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Anthony Reznik Act"; revising the definition of the term "aggressive careless driving"; providing a civil penalty for aggressive careless driving and aggressive careless driving resulting in damage to the property or person of another or serious bodily injury to another person; requiring persons convicted of such offense to attend a specified driver improvement course to maintain their driver license; authorizing a court to order such persons to pay restitution, etc.
Title
Aggressive Careless Driving
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/544 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/544/BillText/Filed/HTML |