FL S0542 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting state-financed constructors from commencing construction of certain structures in coastal areas without first conducting a sea level impact projection study and having such study published and approved by the Department of Environmental Protection; requiring the department to publish such studies on its website, subject to certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Financing of Construction Projects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-10-18SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback