FL S0540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legal Affairs to establish a certain direct-support organization; requiring the direct-support organization, in conjunction with the Statewide Council on Human Trafficking, to form certain partnerships for specified purposes; requiring a public lodging establishment to train certain employees and create certain policies relating to human trafficking by a specified date; requiring that the criminal history record of a person who is convicted of, or who enters a plea of guilty or nolo contendere to, soliciting, inducing, enticing, or procuring another to commit prostitution, lewdness, or assignation be added to the Soliciting for Prostitution Public Database, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 851 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H851 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-152
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17297 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |