FL S0538 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Division of Emergency Management to create a list of reportable incidents; requiring such list to include certain events; requiring a political subdivision to report incidents contained on the list to the State Watch Office; authorizing the Division of Emergency Management to establish guidelines a political subdivision must follow to report an incident, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#687 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-53
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (093237)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (093237) 1043
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (682306)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-10-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H865 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 538 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/Amendment/639450/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/Amendment/784498/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/Vote/SenateVote_s00538c2011.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/Vote/HouseVote_s00538e1687.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/538/Vote/SenateVote_s00538e1042.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback