FL S0538 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Administration to divest investments, and prohibiting it from investment, in any institution or company or subsidiary of a company domiciled in the United States which does business in or with the government of Venezuela or its agencies or instrumentalities in violation of federal law; authorizing the Governor to waive such requirements under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and Local Governmental Relations with The Government of Venezuela

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 359
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 359
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-29SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/29/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-10-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H279 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H359 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Chapter No. 2018-125
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215472Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback