FL S0536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a notice of rule development to include certain information; requiring an agency to provide notice of a regulatory alternative to the Administrative Procedures Committee before filing the rule for adoption; requiring an agency to provide a copy of any proposal for a lower cost regulatory alternative to the committee within a certain timeframe; requiring the Florida Administrative Code to contain complete indexes to any material incorporated by reference contained in the code, etc.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Appropriations (734958); YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H337 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |