FL S0536 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting for-profit eye banks from procuring certain human organs and tissue for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Procurement of Human Organs and Tissue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1087 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
873 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/536 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/536/BillText/Filed/HTML |