FL S0536 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 875
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the commencement, within a specified timeframe, of counterclaims, cross-claims, and third-party claims that arise out of the conduct, transaction or occurrence set out or attempted to be set out in a pleading for which such claims relate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations of Actions Other Than for the Recovery of Real Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 875
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 875
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-10-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H875 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-97

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback