FL S0526 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the filing deadline for a petition claiming wrongful incarceration; providing limited retroactivity for filing a petition claiming wrongful incarceration; providing that a deceased person's heirs, successors, or assigns do not have standing to file a petition related to the wrongful incarceration of the deceased person; revising eligibility for compensation for wrongful incarceration for a wrongfully incarcerated person; authorizing the Chief Financial Officer to adjust compensation for inflation for persons found to be wrongfully incarcerated after a specified date, etc.
Title
Compensation for Eligible Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H241 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/526 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/526/BillText/Filed/HTML |