FL S0526 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to licensure and permit requirements for business agents; prohibiting a business organization from engaging in certain practices until it is qualified by a qualifying agent; authorizing the executive director or the chair of the board to authorize a temporary qualifying agent for a specified timeframe under certain circumstances; requiring the board to allow an applicant to qualify one or more business organizations or to operate using a fictitious name under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deregulation of Professions and Occupations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-30SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2018-01-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-24SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H15 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1114 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1041 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback