FL S0524 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a pharmacist testing for and treating the influenza virus and streptococcal infections to maintain patient records using certain standards and for a specified time; requiring a pharmacist seeking to test for and treat the influenza virus and streptococcal infections to obtain certification through a certification program approved by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Board of Osteopathic Medicine, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Influenza Virus and Streptococcal Infections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H431 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651895Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback