FL S0522 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring advertising platforms to collect and remit taxes for certain transactions; preempting the regulation of vacation rentals to the state; preempting the regulation of advertising platforms to the state; requiring licenses issued by the Division of Hotels and Restaurants of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to be displayed conspicuously to the public inside the licensed establishment; requiring advertising platforms to adopt an antidiscrimination policy and to inform their users of the policy's provisions; authorizing the department to adopt emergency rules; providing requirements and an expiration for such rules, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-02-18SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
2021-02-18SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism
2021-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-16SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2021-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H219 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Now in Ways & Means Committee
H1481 (Similar To) 2021-02-26 - Filed
S1988 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback