FL S0522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 281
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 281
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to obtain specified information from a facility where a parent is incarcerated under certain circumstances; requiring that a parent who is incarcerated be included in case planning and provided with a copy of the case plan; specifying that the incarcerated parent is responsible for complying with facility procedures and policies to access services or maintain contact with his or her children as provided in the case plan, etc.
Title
Incarcerated Parents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 281 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Substituted HB 281 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H281 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-45