FL S0520 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing, rather than requiring, a court to impose the jury's recommended sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of parole for certain capital felonies; requiring the court to enter a written order addressing the sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of parole and include in its required written order the reasons for not accepting a jury's recommended sentence, if applicable, etc.
Title
Sentencing for Capital Felonies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
S450 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Chapter No. 2023-23
H555 (Similar To) 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
S450 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Chapter No. 2023-23
H555 (Similar To) 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/520 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/520/BillText/Filed/HTML |