FL S0520 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7059
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an applicant for licensure as an optometrist to submit proof to the Department of Health that she or he meets certain requirements; providing that an applicant must pass the licensure examination within a specified timeframe as a condition of licensure as an optometrist and certification to administer and prescribe ocular pharmaceutical agents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7059
2018-03-02SenateSubstituted HB 7059
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-25SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-24SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/24/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7059 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-78
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1486 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4630057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
463006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback