FL S0516 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting for-profit eye banks from procuring certain human organs and tissue for specified purposes; providing exceptions, etc.
Title
Procurement Activities of For-profit Eye Banks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/02/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
873 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |