FL S0512 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing language that may be used to waive spousal homestead rights concerning devise restrictions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#809 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-22
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 421
2018-03-04HouseReceived
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-07SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-01SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-06SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H421 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 512

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7327025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback