FL S0508 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising application requirements for forwarding agents when applying to the Department of Revenue for a certain certificate; requiring a forwarding agent that applies for and receives such certificate to notify the department within a specified timeframe under certain circumstances; prohibiting the department from requiring a forwarding agent to resubmit an application during a certain timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forwarding Agent Certificates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-12-05SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2023-11-16SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback