FL S0502 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Hurricane Michael Recovery Task Force adjunct to the Division of Emergency Management to make recommendations to the Legislature regarding additional assistance needed in the response to recovery from and mitigation of the effects of Hurricane Michael in certain areas; requiring the task force to review the local, state, and federal activities conducted and the resources provided in such areas, the effectiveness of such efforts, and any additional assistance necessary; subject to the appropriation of funds, creating the Hurricane Housing Recovery Program to provide funds to local governments for certain affordable housing recovery efforts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Mitigation and Response

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-01SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-10-14SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback