FL S0500 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the importing into the state of, or the distributing, transporting, transferring, selling, or giving of, an assault weapon or large-capacity magazine; prohibiting the possession of an assault weapon or large-capacity magazine; providing exceptions; requiring certificates of possession for assault weapons or large-capacity magazines lawfully possessed before a specified date; providing enhanced criminal penalties for certain offenses when committed with an assault weapon or large-capacity magazine, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H455 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S466 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H553 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27366Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback