FL S0496 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 59
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying requirements for certain comprehensive plans effective, rather than adopted, after a specified date and for associated land development regulations; requiring local governments to include a property rights element in their comprehensive plans; prohibiting a local government's property rights element from conflicting with the statement of rights contained in the act; providing that the consent of certain property owners is not required for development agreement changes under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growth Management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 59
2021-04-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 59
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-07SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21
2021-03-30SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2021-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-25SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2021-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-18SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2021-03-17SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-15SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-10SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2021-03-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2021-03-03SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-03SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-01-15SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2021-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H59 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/BillText/c3/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Amendment/752852/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Amendment/135832/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/496/Analyses/2021s00496.rc.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback