FL S0496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing an employee of the Florida Insurance Guaranty Association or an employee of a guaranty association of another state to adjust losses for the Florida Insurance Guaranty Association if certain conditions are met; revising requirements for the Office of Insurance Regulation in levying assessments on workers' compensation insurers; requiring such insurers to recoup the assessments by applying a certain surcharge percentage to certain policies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Guaranty Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 03/19/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H429 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6268621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631576Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631914Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback