FL S0496 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a parent to give public testimony regarding a district school board's suspension policy at a specified meeting; requiring a district school board to review its rules authorizing suspension during a specified timeframe at a district school board meeting; requiring the board to take public testimony at the meeting, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-school Suspension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2017-10-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H563 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback