FL S0492 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability (OPPAGA) to conduct a study regarding the relocation of the state capital; prescribing requirements for the study; requiring OPPAGA to submit a report to the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Capital Relocation Study
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] | Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/492 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/492/BillText/Filed/HTML |