FL S0492 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-97
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-97
Summary
Increases the amount of wages of a head of family which is exempt from garnishment. Provides a form that must be used for an agreement to waive the exemption from garnishment. Increases the amount of wages of a head of family which is exempt from garnishment.
Title
Garnishment/Exemption of Wages [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Chapter No. 2010-97 | |
2010-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01215; CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 1 -HJ 01215 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01166; Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 409 -HJ 01166 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01096; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01096 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-16 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00624; CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00624 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00584; Amendment(s) adopted (899656) -SJ 00584; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00584 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00270 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00270; CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -SJ 00271 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 401-S --Amendment adopted-Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Judiciary -SJ 00041 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Commerce; Judiciary | |
2009-10-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0409 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 492; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2010-97) -HJ 01166
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0077 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0222 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0492&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |