FL S0486 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Child Safety Alarm Act"; requiring vehicles used by child care facilities and large family child care homes to be equipped with a reliable alarm system that prompts the driver to inspect the vehicle for children before exiting the vehicle; requiring the Department of Children and Families to adopt by rule minimum safety standards and maintain a list of approved alarm systems, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-13SenateNow in Transportation
2018-02-12SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Rules
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H305 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback