FL S0484 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing each county to create a supervised bond release program; providing an exception to a county that has already established and implemented a supervised bond program that utilizes a risk assessment instrument; authorizing the county to contract with the Department of Corrections to develop or modify a risk assessment instrument if such instrument meets certain requirements; requiring each county that establishes a supervised bond program to submit a report annually by a certain date to the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability (OPPAGA); authorizing a court to sentence offenders to a county jail for up to 24 months under certain circumstances for offenses committed after a specified date; requiring sentencing conditions; authorizing the department to extend the limits of confinement to allow an inmate to participate in supervised community release, subject to certain requirements, as prescribed by the department by rule, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-31SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-11-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-13SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H885 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1206 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H885 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1206 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
907042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921188Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
950021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback