FL S0474 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment (POLST) Program within the Department of Health; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to establish and maintain a database of compassionate and palliative care plans by a specified date; authorizing specified personnel to withhold or withdraw cardiopulmonary resuscitation if presented with a POLST form that contains an order not to resuscitate the patient; requiring the Department of Elderly Affairs, in consultation with the agency, to adopt by rule procedures for the implementation of POLST forms in hospice care, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Orders for Life-sustaining Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S476 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H1341 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback