FL S0472 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting the Joint Committee on the Library of Congress to approve the replacement of the statue of Confederate General Edmund Kirby Smith in the National Statuary Hall Collection with a statue of Mary McLeod Bethune; providing for the transfer of ownership of the statue of General Edmund Kirby Smith to the state; providing that the act is an official request to the Joint Committee on the Library of Congress, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Statuary Hall

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#632 (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-19
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-21SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-02-20HousePassed; YEAS 111 NAYS 1
2018-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-20HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 139
2018-02-15HouseReceived
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-01-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (965934)
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-16SenateNow in Rules
2017-11-15SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 11/15/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H139 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 472
H73 (Similar To) 2017-10-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S184 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback