FL S0470 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the prohibition on beer samplings at the premises of vendors licensed for off-premises sales only; authorizing malt beverage tastings on the licensed premises of certain vendors, subject to certain requirements, limitations, liabilities, and penalties; providing construction with respect to special acts and ordinances; authorizing rulemaking; revising the prohibition on cooperative advertising with a vendor and prohibiting certain persons from naming vendors in advertising for malt beverage tastings, etc.
Title
Malt Beverage Tastings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/14, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0283 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1329 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
S1714 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1329 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
S1714 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |