FL S0468 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 914 (Ch. 2023-252)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 914 (Ch. 2023-252)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the purposes of the Commission on Mental Health and Substance Abuse to include an assessment of the state's suicide prevention infrastructure; revising the duties of the commission to include duties relating to the state's suicide prevention infrastructure, etc.
Title
Suicide Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 914 (Ch. 2023-252) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Rules |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H655 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 914 (Ch. 2023-252)
S914 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-252
S914 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-252
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/468 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/468/BillText/Filed/HTML |