FL S0468 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Ronald Reagan license plate; establishing an annual use fee for the plate; providing for distribution and use of fees collected from the sale of the plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Ronald Reagan License Plate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback