FL S0466 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the MCMF Program Office of Veterans Advocacy within the Department of Health; requiring the MCMF Program, through the Department of Economic Opportunity, to assist certain veterans and their spouses with specified tasks; requiring Florida Is for Veterans, Inc., to collaborate with specified entities to implement the MCMF Program, etc.
Title
Military Corpsmen and Medics of Florida (MCMF) Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H131 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 0963 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |