FL S0466 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability (OPPAGA) to conduct a study on the presentencing information provided to judges in this state and the manner by which that information is provided; requiring OPPAGA to examine alternative means of providing such information; requiring the Department of Corrections and the Office of the State Courts Administrator, upon request, to assist OPPAGA with the study, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Presentencing Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback