FL S0466 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "low-voltage alarm system project" and adding the definition of the term "wireless alarm system"; providing that a permit is not required to install, maintain, inspect, replace, or service a wireless alarm system and its ancillary components; prohibiting a local enforcement agency from requiring the payment of any additional fees, charges, or expenses associated with the installation or replacement of a new or existing alarm system, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low-voltage Alarm Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#208 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-50
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 413
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-14SenateImmediately certified
2015-04-14SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2015-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2015-03-17SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-17SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-06SenateNow in Community Affairs
2015-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-04SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/04/15, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2015-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0413 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 466 (Ch. 2015-50)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
553793Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback