FL S0464 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that Florida releasees and county and municipal prisoners who receive funds in the form of payment instruments upon their release may not be charged a fee for cashing the instruments at specified businesses, etc.
Title
Payments to Prisoners Upon Release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H279 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 6125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |