FL S0464 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-79; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7129 (Ch. 2010-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends specified provision relating to provisions authorizing leave of absence for officers and employees of the state or counties, municipalities, or political subdivisions who are commissioned reserve officers or reserve enlisted personnel in the United States military or naval service or who are members of the National Guard. Provides for the appointment of a second Assistant Adjutant General for the Florida National Guard Army, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Affairs/Leave of Absence [GPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0851 - Passage (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-79; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7129 (Ch. 2010-182)
2010-04-27 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00924
2010-04-21 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00720
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted for CS/HB 129 -HJ 00806; Read 2nd time -HJ 00806; Read 3rd time -HJ 00806; CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 0 -HJ 00806
2010-04-19 Received -HJ 00755; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00756
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-08 Read 3rd time -SJ 00520; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00520
2010-04-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00511
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00040; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S; Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/17/10, 2:45 pm, 309-C; CS by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00165; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00154; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00165
2010-03-01 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2010-02-19 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-02-17 CS by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2010-02-05 On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/17/10, 2:45 pm, 309-C
2010-02-02 Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2010-01-25 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S
2010-01-21 Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2010-01-20 Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2010-01-12 On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S
2009-12-09 Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2009-10-15 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0129 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 464; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 464 (Ch. 2010-79), CS/HB 7129 (Ch. 2010-182) -HJ 00806
H7129 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-182; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/SB 464 (Ch. 2010-79)
S0274 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7129 (Ch. 2010-182), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/SB 464 (Ch. 2010-79)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
011507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
025010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0464&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0464.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0464c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0464er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB04640408100012.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB04640421100851.html

Bill Comments

feedback