FL S0462 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the performance of advanced well stimulation treatments; clarifying that permits for drilling or operating a well do not authorize the performance of advanced well stimulation treatments, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Well Stimulation Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2018-02-05SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/05/18, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-10-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H237 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S834 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37719Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3772405Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback