FL S0458 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the English Language Learner Advisory Council adjunct to the Department of Education; providing the purpose of the advisory council; specifying the composition of the advisory council, the appointment of members, and the terms they serve, etc.
Title
English Language Learner Advisory Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/458 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/458/BillText/Filed/HTML |