FL S0450 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting provisions relating to the future repeal of ss. 458.3265 and 459.0137, F.S., etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pain Management Clinics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#186 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-49
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 4017
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-02HouseIn Messages
2015-04-01SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-03-24SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/15
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2015-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/18/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-03-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2015-02-17SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2015-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H4017 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 450 (Ch. 2015-49)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback