FL S0448 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising certain powers, duties, and functions of the agency in collaboration with the Department of Management Services; authorizing the state data center within the agency to extend, up to a specified timeframe, certain service-level agreements; deleting a requirement for a service-level agreement to provide a certain termination notice to the agency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agency for State Technology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-01-24SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-01-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-23SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-10-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1357 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430415Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback