FL S0444 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to contract with a not-for-profit statewide alliance of organizations to provide pregnancy support and wellness services through subcontractors; requiring the contractor to spend a specified percentage of funds on direct client services; specifying the entities eligible for a subcontract, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pregnancy Support Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 41
2018-02-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 41
2018-02-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (840114)
2018-02-07SenateAmendment(s) failed (141520, 183484, 199626, 278352, 440400, 459178, 468406, 930580)
2018-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/18
2018-01-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/18/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-01-09SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-09SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2017-11-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-07SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H41 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-29

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38196Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/373698/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/825380/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/528246/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/889968/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/800340/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/433950/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/929308/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/930580/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/141520/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/199626/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/183484/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/468406/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/278352/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/440400/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/459178/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/444/Amendment/840114/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback