FL S0442 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging the extension of Haiti's temporary protected status designation for at least 18 months beyond its scheduled January 22, 2018, expiration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Haiti's Temporary Protected Status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-11-16SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/16/17, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H263 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback