FL S0440 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the program within the Department of Veterans' Affairs; authorizing the department, the Agency for Health Care Administration, and the Department of Children and Families to jointly negotiate with federal agencies in order to seek federal funding for the program; prohibiting the use of state funds to support the program; providing that the act does not affect a person's eligibility for the state Medicaid program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Veterans Care Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-28HouseIn Messages
2018-02-28SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-02-27SenateAmendment(s) adopted (510846)
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-06SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-06SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 12/06/17, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2017-10-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H403 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback