FL S0440 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to Section 24 of Article I and Sections 4, 7, and 19 of Article III of the State Constitution to make the legislative process more open to the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Process [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00039
2009-12-09 Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2009-10-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0241 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00304New CodeSee Bill Text
00307New CodeSee Bill Text
00319New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback