FL S0438 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising applicability of specified provisions of the Florida Insurance Code to the Office of Insurance Regulation's authority to regulate providers of continuing care and continuing care at-home; specifying conditions that qualify an applicant for a certificate of authority without first obtaining a provisional certificate of authority; providing and revising applicability of certain provisions to a person seeking to assume the role of general partner of a provider or seeking specified ownership, possession, or control of a provider's assets, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Care Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-26SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-01-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H783 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
651011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6510261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6511151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback