FL S0434 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-204
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-204
Summary
Deletes references to inactive organizations represented by members of the Suicide Prevention Coordinating Council and replaces with active organizations. Requires that district school boards provide access to suicide prevention educational resources to all instructional and administrative personnel as part of the school district professional development system.
Title
Suicide Prevention Education [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Larcenia Bullard [D] | Sen. Charles Dean [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Sen. Nan Rich [D] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] | Sen. Frederica Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-204 | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01228; CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 01228 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01174; Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1061 -HJ 01174 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages; Received -HJ 01096; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01096 | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00760; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00760 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00746 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-01 | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-26 | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00353 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00270 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00270; CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -SJ 00271; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/17/10, 8:00 am, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00038 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2009-10-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 434; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 434 (Ch. 2010-204) -HJ 01174
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0014 | 20195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0434&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |